CHORLEY PHOTOGRAPHIC SOCIETY

Charity number: 701819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

photographic society

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,621
Total expenditure: £3,940

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jane M Lines Chair 19 April 2021
None on record
Susan Jackson Trustee 15 April 2023
None on record
Martin Eric Coupe Trustee 19 April 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.56k £3.50k £2.16k £4.30k £3.62k
Total expenditure £6.02k £654 £3.84k £4.51k £3.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 22 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
St. Marys Parish Centre
Devonshire Road
CHORLEY
PR7 2BY
Phone:
07702 784895