Accounts and annual returns UNITED KINGDOM MUSLIM KUMBHAR ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 701841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 30 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 31 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 31 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 29 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 29 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 30 March 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 13 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 09 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window