Financial history UNITED KINGDOM MUSLIM KUMBHAR ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 701841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £78.86k £60.37k £139.98k £28.26k £31.20k
Total expenditure £9.43k £12.16k £136.25k £30.60k £23.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £21.74k £11.80k N/A N/A