THE SYKES LODGE NO 1040 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RACE NIGHTS, SPONSORED EVENTS, GARDEN PARTIES, MEMBERS DONATIONS. SUPPORTING NATIONAL AND LOCAL CHARITIESS. GRANTS TO DESERVING LOCAL ORGANISATIONS AND INDIVIDUAL. E.G. GUIDES, SCOUTS, PARTICIPANTS IN DISABLED GAMES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 17 August 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Knowles | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Vere Hanrahan | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Antony Wood | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.20k | £0 | £2.04k | £3.01k | £3.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £400 | £0 | £1.27k | £3.66k | £2.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 15 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 APRIL 1988
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE RELIEF OF POOR AND DISTRESSED MASONS OR THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Masonic Hall
25 Lockwood Street
DRIFFIELD
YO25 6RU
- Phone:
- 07774321490
- Email:
- sykes1040@gmail.com
- Website:
-
n.a
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window