THE HOSPICE OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Bassetlaw Hospice, working in partnership with the Nottinghamshire Foundation NHS Trust, provides facilities and services to support palliative care for the local community. It exists to enable patients living with a progressive life limiting illness and their carers, to achieve the best quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 09 August 1989: Standard registration
- BASSETLAW HOSPICE OF THE GOOD SHEPHERD (Working name)
- CEDAR HOUSE (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL WILLIAM QUIGLEY MBE | Chair |
|
||||||||
David Bamford | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Pamela Jane Jefferson | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dawn Cragg MBE | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Tromans | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|||||||
DOROTHY BASTOW | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||
DR Roger Robinson | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Childs | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
BARRIE SPENCER | Trustee | 15 December 2011 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID THOMAS CASHMORE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £418.50k | £556.99k | £620.26k | £598.56k | £430.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £888.04k | £418.60k | £437.38k | £545.06k | £513.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £48.66k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £393.52k | £443.65k | £272.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £33.60k | £84.03k | £104.38k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £10 | £500 | £2.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £81.20k | £92.07k | £219.10k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £48.66k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £262.61k | £304.36k | £140.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £288.50k | £274.71k | £359.35k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £130.10k | £162.68k | £185.72k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £8.29k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £14.61k | £16.72k | £18.65k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 30 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PAIN SUFFERING AND DISEASE AMONGST TERMINALLY ILL PERSONS IN RETFORD, WORKSOP AND DISTRICTS BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF ANY INSTITUTION THAT PROVIDES SUCH CARE
Area of benefit
RETFORD, WORKSOP AND DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BASSETLAW HOSPICE OF THE GOOD SHEPH
NORTH ROAD
RETFORD
DN22 7XF
- Phone:
- 01777863270
- Email:
- give@bassetlawhospice.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window