Accounts and annual returns THE GRIMSBY CLEETHORPES AND DISTRICT SUNDAY FOOTBALL LEAGUE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 701886
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 03 August 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2015 12 October 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2015 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2014 12 August 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2014 Not Required