Belle Isle Senior Action - BISA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works in the Belle Isle area of Leeds and supports older people to remain living at home. We offer activities in the following areas of need: Social Contact; Health Promotion; Safety & Security; Winter Warmth and help around the House and Home.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £117,272 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Leeds City
Governance
- 15 August 1989: Standard registration
- BELLE ISLE ELDERLY WINTER AID (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Geldard | Chair | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Margaret Whitfield | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Palfreyman | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Griffiths | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elizabeth BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.28k | £199.16k | £160.58k | £173.47k | £173.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.26k | £140.79k | £166.43k | £216.39k | £235.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £139.22k | £161.63k | £123.80k | £133.25k | £117.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 1989 AS AMENDED 2 JUNE 1992. as amended on 18 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE AGED IN THE BELLE ISLE NEIGHBOURHOOD OF LEEDS AND IN PARTICULAR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THE AGED. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE AGED IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN RELATION TO FINANCIAL, HEALTH, HOUSING AND WELFARE ENTITLEMENTS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND PROMOTION OF RESEARCH CONCERNING THE NEEDS OF THE AGED IN RELATION TO THE PROVISIONS OF FUEL HEATH AND LIGHT, AN THE*
Area of benefit
BELLE ISLE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 BROOM CRESCENT
LEEDS
LS10 3JN
- Phone:
- 01132778208
- Email:
- info@belleisle.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window