THE GREAT GLEN UNITED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief to any resident of Great Glen who is facing financial hardship, distress or sickness Support to any Great Glen resident who requires financial assistance to further their education Support to local organisations that promote social welfare such as clubs and sporting activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 17 May 1989: Standard registration
- 04 June 2019: Funds received from 231977 GREAT GLEN RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- GREAT GLEN TOWN CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yannette Rea | Chair | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Wilkinson | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Wilkinson | Trustee | 30 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
FRAZER GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW DUERDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.76k | £4.12k | £4.60k | £4.80k | £5.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217 | £3.14k | £500 | £3.75k | £1.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 17 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS, OR IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT: (A) THE RELIEF OF THE AGED, IMPOTENT AND POOR; (B) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AND SICKNESS; (C) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; (D) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GLEN MAGNA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Old Vicarage
Church Road
Great Glen
LEICESTER
LE8 9FE
- Phone:
- 01162592946
- Email:
- yani.rea@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window