Financial history WARWICK AMBULANCE ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 701904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £15.13k £36.53k £10.26k £7.81k £14.70k
Total expenditure £20.27k £17.02k £21.14k £23.21k £21.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £4.00k £12.50k N/A N/A N/A