Accounts and annual returns TORRINGTON HOUSE HOLIDAY HOME FUND

Charity number: 701905
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2007 01 May 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 08 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2005 31 July 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 31 July 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2004 02 August 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 02 August 2005 On Time