Governing document HALAS HOMES

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28 MAR 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JAN 1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JAN 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 MAR 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 SEP 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 MAR 2023
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1.1.1 THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WITH A LEARNING DISABILITY IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THEM AND TO PROMOTE AWARENESS OF LEARNING DISABILITIES; AND 1.1.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION, FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE A NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.