Financial history LEICESTERSHIRE MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 701925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £138.01k £253.47k £243.29k £168.14k £206.63k
Total expenditure £154.19k £160.99k £147.80k £136.40k £156.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £67.51k £8.30k N/A N/A