Trustees LEICESTERSHIRE MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 701925
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Crossley Trustee 29 June 2023
None on record
Anne Skevington Trustee 22 June 2022
None on record
Ryan Archer Trustee 26 August 2020
None on record
Lloyd James Wells Trustee 15 June 2019
None on record
Lesley Butcher Trustee 13 June 2019
None on record
ROGER GREIBEL Trustee 10 June 2017
None on record
STEVE WILSON Trustee 10 June 2017
None on record
Howard Fredrick Proudman Trustee 04 September 2015
None on record
ELIZABETH WOODS Trustee 31 March 2011
None on record