THE YMCA OTTERBURN HALL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northumberland
Governance
- 18 September 1989: Standard registration
- 29 August 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.51k | £29.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.54k | £33.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 25 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 25 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 23 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 23 September 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JUNE 1989.
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST FOR THE USE AND OCCUPATION OF HERRINGTON BURN YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION AS A YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SPIRITUAL FITNESS, TRAINING AND WELL-BEING OF YOUTH AGED PRIMARILY 14-21 YEARS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RULES AND PRINCIPLES FROM TIME TO TIME APPROVED AND ADOPTED BY THE NATIONAL COUNCIL OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS (INOORPORATED AND FOR ALL PURPOSES INCIDENTAL THERETO HAVING REGARD TO ANY SPECIAL NEEDS OF THE LOCALITY AND OF THE YOUTH THEREIN WHICH MAY ARISE WITH THE VARYING CIRCUMSTANCES OF FUTURE TIMES WITH POWER SO FAR AS THOUGHT FIT AND SUBJECT AS HEREINAFTER PROVIDED TO CONVERT THE SAID PREMISES OR ANY PART THEROF FOR USE AS, OR CONSTRUCT UPON, THESAID LAND A HOSTEL OR RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR YOUTH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE OTTERBURN.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window