COMMUNITY TRANSPORT MACCLESFIELD DISTRICT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity operates transport and shopmobility services throughout Macclesfield Borough for individuals unable to use public transport. A community car scheme with volunteer drivers using their own cars is operated part of which is operated in close liaison with the local NHS Trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
Governance
- 20 September 1989: Standard registration
- 06 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- COMMUNITY TRANSPORT MACCLESFIELD BOROUGH (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.83k | £82.07k | £59.04k | £56.00k | £41.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.63k | £126.93k | £115.98k | £103.00k | £90.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 26 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
26 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 24 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 24 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 05 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 05 January 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/02/1989 AS AMENDED ON 04/09/1989 AS AMENDED ON 13/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 21/05/2009 AS AMENDED ON 12/03/2012
Charitable objects
I) TO PROVIDE A TRANSPORT SERVICE IN THE CHESHIRE EAST DISTRICT OF MACCLESFIELD FOR THE USE OF INDIVIDUALS IN SPECIFIC NEED WHO BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, POVERTY, SICKNESS, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY ARE UNABLE TO USE OR HAVE DIFFICULTY IN USING PUBLIC TRANSPORT AND FOR USE BY CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS AND/OR CHARITABLE GROUPS WHO ARE AFFILIATED TO CTMD II) TO ORGANISE AND OVERSEE A COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR USE BY THE BENEFICIARIES AND THEIR ESCORTS AND DEPENDENTS. III) TO CO-OPERATE AND COLLABORATE WITH STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS CONCERNED WITH THE WELFARE OF THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED AND PROVIDE TRANSPORT FACILITIES FOR USE BY THOSE BODIES IN THE RELIEF OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
MACCLESFIELD DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window