CYFEILLION AMGUEDDFA CYMRU - FRIENDS OF NATIONAL MUSEUM WALES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the National Museum Wales. To raise funds to support museum projects. To act in an ambassadorial role. To convey views to the Museum when requested.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 18 September 1989: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF THE NATIONAL MUSEUMS AND GALLERIES OF WALES (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL MUSEUM OF WALES SOCIETY (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL MUSEUMS AND GALLERIES OF WALES SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gwendolyn WILLIAMS | Chair | 15 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr JUDITH FOY | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILKINS | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Owen | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Lesley Lewis | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Sheen | Trustee | 02 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Leonard Carlyle Metcalfe | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Margaret Jones | Trustee | 04 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christabel Lynda Hutchings FSA | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|||||
David Emrys Pryce Jones | Trustee | 05 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROGER David GAGG | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CLIVE CARTER | Trustee | 01 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
DIANE DAVIES | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
DORN SWAFFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr PETER Martin DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.36k | £16.61k | £19.80k | £19.94k | £24.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.55k | £25.04k | £33.47k | £7.75k | £24.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 May 2024 | 121 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED 4 NOVEMBER 1995. AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 13 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 10 NOVEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED ON 07 NOV 2009 AS AMENDED ON 07 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED ON 05 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED ON 06 NOV 2019 as amended on 02 Dec 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FRIENDS SHALL BE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE, AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE MUSEUM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
60 Ardwyn
Pantmawr
CARDIFF
CF14 7HD
- Phone:
- 02920 625962
- Email:
- lyn_owen1@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window