NORTH OF ENGLAND BONE MARROW AND THALASSAEMIA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Associations activities centre on its aims which are: * To help and support patients who are affected by Thalassaemia * To increase the awareness of the disorder in the communities which are at high risk * To stimulate discussion concerning Thalassaemia and patient demands such as: The best available treatment; Monitoring therapy; Bone Marrow transplantation; new developments & treatments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 September 1989: Standard registration
- BLACKBURN AND DISTRICT BONE MARROW AND THALASSAEMIA TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- BLACKBURN AND DISTRICT BONE MARROW TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Sajida Rasul | Trustee | 10 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAHMOOD REHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SALMA JASSAT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMINA PATEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZANIB RASUL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.60k | £1.74k | £0 | £411 | £1.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £724 | £3.85k | £836 | £374 | £400 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2024 | 312 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 March 2023 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 April 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 April 2022 | 435 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 SEPTEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 1995 AND 11 JUNE 2000.
Charitable objects
RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM THALASSAEMIA AND THE PROMOTION AND CO-ORDINATION OF RESEARCH IN CONNECTION THERETO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CMFT NHS Trut
Chest Clinic
352 Oxford Road
MANCHESTER
M13 9NL
- Phone:
- 01612737200
- Email:
- zanib.rasul@cmft.nhs.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window