Financial history BIRMINGHAM MULTI-CARE SUPPORT SERVICES LTD

Charity number: 702019
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £796.73k £775.74k £927.07k £827.21k £580.24k
Total expenditure £849.38k £728.82k £790.30k £821.41k £521.87k
Income from government contracts £175.97k £191.25k £245.11k £233.10k £166.21k
Income from government grants £192.18k £360.76k £228.04k £182.22k £151.54k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £360.76k £228.04k £182.22k £151.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £795.25k £414.73k £697.47k £645.00k £408.35k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £19 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £1.46k £257 £1.57k £0 £20.36k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £849.38k £728.82k £790.30k £821.41k £521.87k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £9.15k £7.66k £8.84k £11.88k £7.26k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0