Accounts and annual returns VICARAGE LODGE PRESCHOOL

Charity number: 702025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 16 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 16 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 20 September 2024 82 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 20 September 2024 82 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 July 2023 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 July 2023 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 26 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 16 September 2022 78 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 July 2021 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 July 2021 28 days late Download Open in new window