Financial history GUISBOROUGH CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity Number: 702049
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £22.43k £19.19k £19.26k £20.31k £27.28k
Total expenditure £41.95k £37.45k £31.03k £33.55k £31.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A