6th Scunthorpe (Messingham) Scout Group

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting activities. Group includes Scout, Cub and Beaver sections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 06 October 1989: Standard registration
- 20 September 2023: Funds received from 222826 MESSINGHAM TEMPERANCE HALL FUND
- MESSINGHAM SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- 6TH SCUNTHORPE SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Coyle | Chair | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Grace Spooner | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ben Robert Lowry | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel West | Trustee | 15 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Marshall | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen James Parkin | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adam Kelvey Walker | Trustee | 29 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Howsam | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynsey Lowry | Trustee | 04 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Shona Lewis Cannings | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
David John Bradley | Trustee |
|
||||||
Elizabeth Mary Lidgett | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.90k | £813 | £8.91k | £9.09k | £18.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.90k | £1.89k | £5.10k | £8.66k | £12.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Field House
Scotter Road
Scotton
Gainsborough
DN21 3HS
- Phone:
- 01724762234
- Email:
- LIZ.LIDGETT@TISCALI.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window