PEWTERSPEAR GREEN TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide and maintain some 45 acres of land within the area known as Pewterspear Green as an open space, parkland, and sports recreation ground in the interests of social welfare and leisure time occupation of the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warrington
Governance
- 03 October 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dennis John Buckley | Chair | 07 October 2021 |
|
|||||
COLIN PARRY | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter Christian Iles-Smith | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID FREDERICK WAKEFIELD | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN TRUSCOTT | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
LAURENCE ROY PANES | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
TOM LEE WARBURTON | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
COUNCILLOR JUDITH WHEELER | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev ALAN JEWELL | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Richard Hartland | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHIL PEGUM | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr RICHARD THOMAS JOHNSON | Trustee | 25 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.05k | £55.49k | £61.47k | £75.86k | £151.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £173.49k | £203.90k | £193.73k | £225.32k | £209.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 24 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 SEP 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND MAINTAIN LAND WITHIN THE AREA KNOWN AS PEWTERSPEAR GREEN AS AN OPEN SPACE, PARKLAND AND RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STRETTON AND APPLETON
Contact information
- Address:
-
PEWTERSPEAR GREEN PAVILION
BEAMISH CLOSE
STRETTON
WARRINGTON
CHESHIRE
WA4 5RL
- Phone:
- 01925377250
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window