Financial history WARRINGTON BEREAVEMENT SUPPORT

Charity Number: 702088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.70k £10.71k £10.69k £5.80k £14.72k
Total expenditure £9.83k £9.03k £6.51k £9.73k £9.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.69k N/A £13.74k