Financial history The Holistic Cancer Centre

Charity number: 702114
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £146.28k £199.99k £151.00k £164.31k £189.04k
Total expenditure £139.10k £121.45k £143.65k £173.37k £167.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £43.25k £50.46k £43.25k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £14.20k N/A N/A