Accounts and annual returns LLANFAES PLAY AREA ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 702147
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 May 2024 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 February 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 March 2022 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 February 2021 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required