Financial history MARY CLOWES HALL

Charity number: 702162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.35k £24.88k £8.42k £13.91k £20.15k
Total expenditure £5.30k £10.71k £14.94k £20.64k £9.39k
Income from government contracts £4.50k £4.50k N/A N/A £15.00k
Income from government grants £10.00k £17.67k N/A N/A N/A