THE CAEDMON / CEOLFRID TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise and apply funds for the benefit of past and present members (including staff) of the College of St. Hild & St. Bede specifically in the advancement of education at the College of St. Hild & St. Bede.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 07 November 1989: Standard registration
- THE CEOLFRID TRUST (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Michael Withinshaw | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN REBECCA SWINSON | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR SIMON FORREST PhD MA BA | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN STANLEY HECKS | Trustee | 02 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GLENN MILLER | Trustee | 28 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARAH ELIZABETH LEACY LLB | Trustee | 07 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £307 | £18.70k | £10.52k | £31 | £9.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.70k | £6.47k | £10.13k | £13.48k | £5.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 24 January 2025 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 AUGUST 1988 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 MAY 1993
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AT THE COLLEGE OF ST HILD AND ST BEDE AND RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE (FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY) OF PAST AND PRESENT STUDENTS AND STAFF OF THE COLLEGE AND THEIR WIVES, WIDOWS AND CHILDREN AND OTHER DEPENDANTS BEING IN NEED OF RELIEF OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. HILD & ST. BEDE COLLEGE
RUSHFORD COURT
NORTH ROAD
WESTERN HILL
DURHAM
DH1 4RY
- Phone:
- 01913348531
- Email:
- SIMON.FORREST@DURHAM.AC.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window