CARSTAIRS COUNTRYSIDE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Carstairs Countryside Trust is a nature conservation charity. It owns and manages land, especially in the sensitive Lower Derwent Valley
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £131,818 from 4 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Doncaster
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 14 November 1989: Standard registration
- 15 April 2025: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- C C T (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.28k | £176.19k | £160.51k | £343.33k | £184.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.94k | £132.31k | £154.56k | £158.79k | £161.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £63.58k | £140.30k | £145.15k | £148.06k | £131.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 15 SEPTEMBER 1989.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE EITHER THROUGH ITS OWN ACT OR BY SUPPORTING OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES THE CONSERVATION OF THE COUNTRYSIDE AND ITS WILDLIFE IN PARTICULAR THE OTTER WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND MORE ESPECIALLY NORTH YORKSHIRE. (B) TO PROMOTE EITHER THROUGH ITS OWN OR BY SUPPORTING OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES THE PROVISION OF FACILLITIES TO ENABLE DISABLED PERSONS MORE READILY TO GAIN ACCESS TO AND EGRESS FROM THE COUNTRYSIDE SO THAT SUCH PERSONS CAN GAIN GRETER ENJOYMENT THEREFROM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND MORE PARTICUARLY NORTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window