ROTARY CLUB OF LOUGHBOROUGH BEACON TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The fund exists for the relief of the poor and needy or for any other charitable purpose institution society or object as the club may determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 15 November 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Garner Roberts | Chair | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Robert Sharpe | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Leese | Trustee | 06 November 2024 |
|
|||||||
Rosemary Ann Adams | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Oliver Carlisle | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Hugh Michael Pearson | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Roger Ward Williams | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Neil Rowbotham | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.86k | £18.59k | £39.87k | £16.51k | £36.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.41k | £20.49k | £28.17k | £25.20k | £31.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 24 June 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 June 2024 | 46 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13 JUNE 1989
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE CLUB SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Longcliffe Golf Club
Snells Nook Lane
Nanpantan
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE11 3YA
- Phone:
- 01509815523
- Email:
- treasurer@beaconrotary.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window