THE DANCEHOUSE THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote and to stage performances of ballet and theatrical dance. The provision of a suitably equipped, staffed and maintained publicly licensed theatre - The Dancehouse Theatre in Manchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 20 November 1989: Standard registration
- MANCHESTER CITY BALLET COMPANY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Jayne Page | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|||||
David Jones-Owen | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.55k | £26.47k | £4.61k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £275.66k | £196.69k | £90.30k | £17.17k | £14.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.12k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 DECEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION PASSED 31 OCTOBER 1989 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF BALLET AND THEATRICAL DANCE AS ART FORMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
38-42 Brunswick Street West
Hove
East Sussex
BN3 1EL
- Phone:
- 01612371406
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window