FRON PARK CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities General Charitable Purposes Education/Training Overseas aid/Famine relief
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 24 January 1990: Standard registration
- 27 February 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 27 February 2008: Funds transferred to 1122094 NEW LIFE CHURCH HOLYWELL
- THE CHURCH IN THE PARK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.41k | £37.18k | £41.05k | £45.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.67k | £46.88k | £54.66k | £53.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 11 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 11 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 28 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 24 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 24 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 6 DECEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH:-1) PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL, THE TEACHINGS OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES, THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE, THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE.2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK.3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ON THE BASIS OF CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES AND WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION IN ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT.FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE FIRST SCHEDULE OF THE TRUST DEED.
Area of benefit
CLWYD AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window