Financial history THE BOTTESFORD INSTITUTE

Charity number: 702277
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.53k £21.50k £56.29k £13.50k £13.50k
Total expenditure £3.38k £4.48k £5.06k £5.44k £13.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A