Financial history THE FARM ANIMAL SANCTUARY

Charity number: 702287
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £334.83k £207.54k £341.78k £309.49k £335.67k
Total expenditure £205.49k £225.94k £225.93k £287.74k £294.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A