THE MANCHESTER SURGICAL RESEARCH TRUST

Charity Number: 702313
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Practical research and presentation of results

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £12,276
Total expenditure: £37,059

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Manchester City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 December 1989: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • M S R T (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DR PAUL MILLER Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR NIGEL JAMES BUNDRED Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR CHARLES NEVIN MCCOLLUM MD FRCS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £69.35k £79.64k £28.26k £2.33k £12.28k
Total expenditure £190.02k £59.29k £61.98k £120.60k £37.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 28 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
2ND FLOOR
EDUCATION AND RESEARCH CENTRE
WYTHENSHAWE HOSPITAL
MANCHESTER
M23 9LT
Phone:
01612915853
Email:
No information available