COLUMBIA VILLAGE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Columbia Community Centre is a locally run hub, offering help, advice and support to all, It holds regular committee meetings, trains and supports its volunteers and hosts regular group meetings including weekly coffee mornings, flower arranging, senior clubs, ICT training, dance & exercise groups, yoga, war games society, craft activities, wildlife group, church group and bookings for parties
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £6,536 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sunderland
Governance
- 12 December 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dianne Elizabeth Snowdon | Chair | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Linda Robinson | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Taylor | Trustee | 12 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Scott | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Marion Taylor | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.05k | £12.17k | £448 | £31.13k | £34.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.23k | £4.18k | £3.82k | £17.81k | £34.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £960 | £10.00k | N/A | £15.37k | £6.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 December 2021 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 APRIL 1989 AS AMENDED 14 NOVEMBER 1989
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF COLUMBIA & NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS & THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION & TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN HE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION & LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WIT THE OBJECT IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
COLUMBIA AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Columbia Community Association
Oxclose Road
WASHINGTON
Tyne And Wear
NE38 7EN
- Phone:
- 0191 4172081
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window