THE SUNDERLAND AND NORTH DURHAM ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants, goods, services and advice to the visually impaired.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £73,104 from 2 government contract(s) and £23,188 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 25 January 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allen Curtis | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Duffy | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Rosemary Gregg | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|||||
George Hicks | Trustee | 18 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Kent | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA SCANLAN | Trustee | 20 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Carling | Trustee | 06 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.46k | £172.76k | £155.95k | £469.68k | £275.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.86k | £172.19k | £232.44k | £279.61k | £266.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £66.75k | £87.87k | £73.10k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £23.44k | £36.04k | £23.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 March 2025 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 OCTOBER 1989
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF THE BLIND AND THOSE SUBSTANTIALLY AND PERMANENTLY HANDICAPPED BY DEFECTIVE VISION, REGISTERED AS SUCH WITH THEIR APPROPRIATE LOCAL AUTHORITY AND RESIDING IN THE BOROUGH OF SUNDERLAND AND THE SURROUNDING AREA REFERRED TO IN SCHEDULE ATTACHED TO MEMORANDUM.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF SUNDERLAND AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
53
St Luke's Terrace
Pallion
Sunderland
Tyne and
- Phone:
- 0191 5673939
- Email:
- richard.wood@sundrsb.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window