ROTARY CLUB OF BELPER AND DUFFIELD CHARITABLE TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to 1) Disabled & Elderly People's clubs 2) Disadvantaged/disabled Young People organisations 3) young persons undertaking missions/projects abroad 4) Promising Young People in sport. Youth Leadership Awards. Grants to Rotary Foundation UK & other Rotary Projects. Orphanage project in Kenya Awards to young persons for outstanding achievement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 12 December 1989: Standard registration
- ROTARY CLUB OF BELPER CHARITABLE TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID DARWELL HENSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
John Martin Stamp | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Blurton | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANE LOUISE SMILES | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Coral Lesley Breach | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Charles Martin Drake | Trustee | 09 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN SCOTNEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL ALFRED TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.26k | £4.89k | £10.52k | £20.73k | £15.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.86k | £7.08k | £8.81k | £17.46k | £12.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 07 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 DECEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY OR TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE, INSTITUTION, SOCIETY OR OBJECT AS THE ROTARY CLUB OF BELPER SHALL DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 CHESTNUT CLOSE
DUFFIELD
BELPER
DE56 4HD
- Phone:
- 01332840468
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window