WIRRAL CHINESE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide social supports to Chinese Community by various activities and groups. There are five subgroups under the umbrellas of Wirral Chinese Association (WCA). They are Luncheon Club, Chinese School, Women's Group, Cultural Group and Youth Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,800 from 2 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Wirral
Governance
- 21 December 1989: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wing Shuen Sibyl Wong | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wai Shan Pun | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Po Yi Fung | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wai Kwan Tsang | Trustee | 22 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Yuen Kim Yung | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Soo Chi Chung | Trustee | 20 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
ZHUYUN SHEN | Trustee | 12 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN W Y KOO | Trustee | 12 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE CHOI HA JOU | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TIEU BINH TIEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVE HOK LEUNG TAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PO CHUEN RITA LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.45k | £28.71k | £62.94k | £58.51k | £88.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.01k | £25.76k | £32.94k | £40.38k | £47.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | £25.00k | £26.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 NOVEMBER 1989 AS AMENDED ON 23 MARCH 1997.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHINESE ORIGIN LIVING ON THE WIRRAL MERSEYSIDE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASONS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
WIRRAL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Laurences Primary School
12-14 St. Laurence Drive
BIRKENHEAD
CH41 3JD
- Phone:
- 07771590568
- Email:
- wirralchinese@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window