Trustees HYLTON WOMENS INSTITUTE
Charity Number: 702346

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE LETITIA WILSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Etherington | Trustee | 17 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Carr | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Beverley Ann Milner | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Georgina French | Trustee | 08 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
RITA PREST | Trustee | 05 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA MACKENZIE | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOAN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MURIEL FARRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.