BIRMINGHAM FOSTER CARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of distress amongst foster carers working for Birmingham Social Services Department and specific family placement carers living in Birmingham and surrounding districts by provision of training, education advice, information and other charitable forms of support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 25 January 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Cook | Chair | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MANDY BLAIR | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA WILLIS Treasurer | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.41k | £7.12k | £8.96k | £22.13k | £8.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.71k | £1.68k | £5.44k | £11.69k | £5.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.73k | N/A | N/A | £15.41k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 February 2025 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 September 2024 | 236 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 February 2023 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 March 2021 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07 SEP 1989 AS AMENDED ON 23 OCT 2003 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2004 AS AMENDED ON 17 OCT 2005 AS AMENDED ON 29 OCT 2006 AS AMENDED ON 15 APR 2013 AS AMENDED ON 11 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
The relief of distress amongst Birmingham Foster carers by the provision of education, training, advice, information and other charitable forms of support
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
444 Chester Road
Sutton Coldfield
BIRMINGHAM
B73 5BS
- Phone:
- 01214643037
- Email:
- BFCA@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window