THE KIRTON IN LINDSEY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aims -¡ the aims of our Society are to advance the knowledge of the people in our area by the study and recording of local history, archaeology, industrial archaeology, topography, architecture, family history, dialect and local customs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
- Lincolnshire
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 20 December 1989: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY HOLLINGSWORTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Frank Roden | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANN CRICK | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
CAROL HIRD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRENDA TYZACK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN ALAN HOLLINGSWORTH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY CRIPPS MBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.30k | £1.74k | £524 | £1.51k | £1.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.38k | £2.24k | £826 | £1.45k | £1.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 June 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 05 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 23 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 SEPTEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED 19 SEPTEMBER 1989 as amended on 22 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION WITHIN ITS AREA BY THE STUDY AND RECORDNG OF LOCAL HISTORY, ARCHAEOLOGY, INDUSTRIAL ARCHAEOLOGY, TOPOGRAPHY, ARCHITECTURE, FAMILY HISTORY, IDALECT AND LOCAL CUSTOMS AS ARE CHARITABLE AT LAW.
Area of benefit
HISTORIC WAPENTAKES OF MANLEY CORRINGHAM AND ASLACOE
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 GROVE STREET
KIRTON LINDSEY
GAINSBOROUGH
DN21 4BY
- Phone:
- 01652648435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window