ALUN ISLWYN GILES NURSING SCHOLARSHIP

Charity number: 702403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintaning a scholarship or scholarships to be from time to time awarded in a manner herinafter mentioned to nurses working in Wales, who hold a statutory qualification in nursing, for the promotion and advancement of the science and art of nursing in Wales.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £129
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 January 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacquelin Marie Davies Chair 11 January 2023
THE HETTIE C HOPKINS GERIATRIC NURSING SCHOLARSHIP
Received: On time
PEOPLE SPEAK UP LTD
Received: On time
Mark Alan Crothers Trustee 13 February 2025
THE HETTIE C HOPKINS GERIATRIC NURSING SCHOLARSHIP
Received: On time
Julie Green Trustee 06 January 2025
None on record
Helen Whyley Trustee 14 February 2019
THE HETTIE C HOPKINS GERIATRIC NURSING SCHOLARSHIP
Received: On time
HELEN JEAN CARLYON Trustee 19 January 2001
THE HETTIE C HOPKINS GERIATRIC NURSING SCHOLARSHIP
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £151 £10 £1 £124 £129
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £750 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RCN WELSH BOARD
TY MAETH
KING GEORGE V DRIVE EAST
CARDIFF
CF14 4XZ
Phone:
02920680769
Website:

No information available