DERBYSHIRE LAW CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a range of legal advice and representation services to the most disadvantaged communities in Derbyshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,221,415
Donations and legacies | £897.80k | |
Charitable activities | £312.13k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £9.49k | |
Other | £1.99k |
Total expenditure:
£1,144,183
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.14m | |
Other | £0 |
£9,492 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £294,502 from 6 government contract(s) and £570,195 from 34 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.14m | |
Retained for future use | £77.23k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.14m | |
Retained for future use | £86.72k |
People

32 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 10 January 1990: Standard registration
- CHESTERFIELD LAW CENTRE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Barker | Trustee | 24 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Sonalee Joshi | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Jennifer Calverley | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Benjamin Youngs | Trustee | 30 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Derrick Skinner | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Nathan Wood | Trustee | 05 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Philip John Smith | Trustee | 07 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Robert Southwell | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Martin Stone | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Jack Woolley | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|||||||
Mick Wilson | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Elaine Tidd | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Robert William Busby | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
||||||
ANGELA MARGARET SUSANNE WEBSTER LCCMD | Trustee | 04 September 2018 |
|
|||||||
SARAH WHITE | Trustee | 28 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
DAVID ROLAND SHAW | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JENNY FLOOD | Trustee | 10 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £882.60k | £1.12m | £1.15m | £1.15m | £1.22m | |
|
Total expenditure | £883.13k | £1.01m | £1.03m | £1.06m | £1.14m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £156.72k | £171.34k | £179.53k | £282.03k | £294.50k | |
|
Income from government grants | £471.75k | £513.25k | £628.92k | £676.70k | £570.20k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £687.61k | £939.26k | £957.29k | £856.15k | £897.80k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £193.63k | £184.23k | £193.53k | £291.77k | £312.13k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £33 | £39 | £28 | £593 | £9.49k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.34k | £1.20k | £870 | £1.18k | £1.99k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £876.15k | £1.00m | £1.03m | £1.06m | £1.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £6.98k | £2.43k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £9.26k | £9.51k | £15.64k | £20.26k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.20k | £19.33k | £10.94k | £7.22k | £5.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £263.69k | £411.48k | £547.53k | £747.23k | £714.60k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £115.20k | £156.99k | £209.82k | £312.79k | £200.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/12/1989 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/05/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2015
Charitable objects
(I) TO RELIEVE POOR PERSONS RESIDENT OR WORKING WITHIN THE AREA OF THE BOROUGH OF CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE AND ANY OTHER GEOGRAPHICAL AREA AS DIRECTED BY THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH LEGAL SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE OBTAIN THROUGH LACK OF MEANS; (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE IMPROVEMENT AND DIFFUSION OF KNOWLEDGE OF THE LAW AND THE PRACTICE OF THE LAW AND THE ADMINISTRATION OF JUSTICE, HAVING REGARD ESPECIALLY TO THOSE AREAS OF THE LAW WHICH ARE OF PARTICULAR CONCERN TO POOR PEOPLE OR ARE DIRECTED TO THE RELIEF OF POVERTY; (III) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE BOROUGH OF CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE AND ANY OTHER GEOGRAPHICAL AREA AS DIRECTED BY THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
DERBYSHIRE LAW CENTRE
1 ROSE HILL EAST
CHESTERFIELD
DERBYSHIRE
S40 1NU
- Phone:
- 01246550674
- Website:
-
derbyshirelawcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window