HATHERSAGE PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain a recreational playing field in Hathersage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 18 January 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Booth Mrs | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Hanley Mrs | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2019 | 01/12/2020 | 01/12/2021 | 01/12/2022 | 01/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4 | £5 | £24.09k | £37.10k | £957 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £32.06k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.00k | £10.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 December 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 December 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 December 2019 | 10 November 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 JUNE 1989.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE PLAYGROUND FACILITIES OF THE KING GEORGE PLAYING FIELD IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA AND OUTSEATS.
Area of benefit
HATHERSAGE AND OUTSEATS
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Moorland Road
Hathersage
HOPE VALLEY
Derbyshire
S32 1BH
- Phone:
- 07368254488
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window