KINGS NORTON CHURCH RESTORATION FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising for Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 18 January 1990: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR BOB KEMP FRICS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Richard Edward Young | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jason Dean Bell | Trustee | 24 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ann Robinson | Trustee | 09 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN JANE PARKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.97k | £813 | £1.08k | £5.34k | £1.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £1.55k | £4.28k | £142 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 JULY 1989
Charitable objects
THE RESTORATION AND REPAIR OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE BAPTIST, KING'S NORTON IN THE COUNTY OF LEICESTERSHIRE.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF KING'S NORTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
OAKTREE HOUSE
MAIN STREET
KINGS NORTON
LEICESTER
LE7 9BF
- Phone:
- 01162596569
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window