BETHEL EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity Number: 702470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

House of Worship

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £21,389
Total expenditure: £21,427

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 January 1990: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Geoffrey Alcock Trustee 05 October 2024
None on record
Charity Siebold Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
Osa Presley Egharevba Trustee 04 July 2024
None on record
Sofia Close Trustee 04 July 2024
None on record
Rev Lazarus Gill Shaheen Trustee 26 June 2017
None on record
KEDDY BANDA Trustee 12 March 2007
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £39.13k £45.40k £33.70k £27.99k £21.39k
Total expenditure £36.71k £36.71k £39.47k £28.62k £21.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 27 July 2024 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

27 July 2024 178 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 May 2023 94 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 May 2023 94 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 April 2022 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 April 2022 88 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 ST. AUSTINS ROAD
PRESTON
PR1 3QT
Phone:
07957777467
Website:

No information available