Trustees THE CIRCLE OF FRIENDS OF CHIRK HOSPITAL
Charity number: 702508

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACKIE ALLEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sheila Dee | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Powell | Trustee | 03 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Griffiths | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sue Roberts | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gill Wells | Trustee | 09 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ros Morris | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Gibbens | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Ron Tudor | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE DAVIES | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA HUMPHREYS | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
Janne Edwards | Trustee | 09 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
RUTH DEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.