Financial history GREYHOUND RESCUE

Charity number: 702522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £63.39k £16.42k £154.62k £18.82k £125.46k
Total expenditure £50.92k £38.54k £46.09k £50.46k £85.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A