THE ESME KIRBY SNOWDONIA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1 To advance the education of the public by the preservation, protection and improvement of the Snowdonia National Park. 2 To provide bursaries and grants to students working in the field of conversation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 09 February 1990: Standard registration
- 05 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE ESME KIRBY SNOWDONIA TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.35k | £3.65k | £1.93k | £4.13k | £27.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.75k | £2.00k | £105.00k | £1.20k | £25.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 12 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 02 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 13 May 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 29 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1990 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 24 DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE SNOWDONIA NATIONAL PARK. 2. TO PROVIDE BURSARIES AND GRANTS OT STUDENTS WORKING IN THE FIELD OF CONSERVATION.
Area of benefit
SNOWDONIA NATIONAL PARK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window