Accounts and annual returns UFFINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 702582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 09 November 2020 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required